NY S01012 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to permitting the enlarged school district of Middletown to establish an insurance reserve fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to permitting the enlarged school district of Middletown to establish an insurance reserve fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to education
2019-02-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-01-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-01-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.29
2019-01-10SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05000 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback