NY S01002 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the childhood lead poisoning prevention and safe housing act of 2010 to make enforcement of lead hazard control standards in the state of New York more certain and more effective; creates a loan fund to assist owners in complying with lead-safe requirements; provides for inspections and certification of inspectors and remediators; requires registration of affected properties; provides tax credits for remediation; provides for appointment of deputy commissioner of housing and community renewal to oversee provisions; provides for educational programs relating to lead poisoning and abatement.
Title
Enacts the childhood lead poisoning prevention and safe housing act of 2010 to make enforcement of lead hazard control standards in the state of New York more certain and more effective; creates a loan fund to assist owners in complying with lead-safe requirements; provides for inspections and certification of inspectors and remediators; requires registration of affected properties; provides tax credits for remediation; provides for appointment of deputy commissioner of housing and community renewal to oversee provisions; provides for educational programs relating to lead poisoning and abatement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-05-06 | PRINT NUMBER 1002A | |
2010-05-06 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | |
2010-05-03 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | |
2009-01-22 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A2087 (Same As) 2010-05-11 - print number 2087a