NY S00997 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the notification in writing of discharge or transfer of minors from attendance upon instruction and the reporting of such data to the legislature; the notification shall include a breakdown of all discharges and dropout of students under 21, reasons therefor, demographics and racial breakdown of all discharged students, the number of students enrolled in GED programs, the number of special education students discharged, the number of English language learner students who have been discharged and what support services were offered before discharge.
Title
Requires the notification in writing of discharge or transfer of minors from attendance upon instruction and the reporting of such data to the legislature; the notification shall include a breakdown of all discharges and dropout of students under 21, reasons therefor, demographics and racial breakdown of all discharged students, the number of students enrolled in GED programs, the number of special education students discharged, the number of English language learner students who have been discharged and what support services were offered before discharge.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Thomas Duane [D] | Sen. Shirley Huntley [D] |
Sen. John Sampson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |