NY S00968 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to sex offender residence limitation; restricts level two and three sex offenders from residing within 1,500 feet of their victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to sex offender residence limitation; restricts level two and three sex offenders from residing within 1,500 feet of their victims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08Assemblyreferred to correction
2018-05-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1055
2018-05-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-05-08Assemblyreferred to correction
2017-05-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-04-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.662
2017-01-05SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A00860 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to correction

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback