NY S00966 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2140B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2140B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of environmental conservation, with the assistance of other state departments and agencies, to conduct a study on the quality of life and human health impacts at John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.
Title
Directs the department of environmental conservation, with the assistance of other state departments and agencies, to conduct a study on the quality of life and human health impacts at John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2140B |
2021-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 966B |
2021-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1482 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 966A |
2021-04-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02140 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - approval memo.91