NY S00964 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - SIGNED CHAP.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - SIGNED CHAP.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redesignates the "Army Captain Clayton Carpenter Memorial Highway" to be the "Major Clayton Carpenter Memorial Highway".
Title
Redesignates the "Army Captain Clayton Carpenter Memorial Highway" to be the "Major Clayton Carpenter Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.37 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.276 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | substituted for a2998 |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.3 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02998 (Same As) 2017-05-09 - substituted by s964