NY S00951 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to revoking a person's driver's license who has been convicted of operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Title
Relates to revoking a person's driver's license who has been convicted of operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol or drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1481 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02614 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to transportation