NY S00951 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes bias-related graffiti in hate crimes.
Title
Includes bias-related graffiti in hate crimes.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 951A |
2014-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.353 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1577 |
2013-06-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08960 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - held for consideration in codes