NY S00933 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to actions or practices that establish or maintain a monopoly, monopsony or restraint of trade; authorizes a class action lawsuit in the state anti-trust law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to actions or practices that establish or maintain a monopoly, monopsony or restraint of trade; authorizes a class action lawsuit in the state anti-trust law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07Assemblyreferred to economic development
2021-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-03SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1480
2021-06-03SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-05-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 933A
2021-05-18SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A01812 (Same As) 2021-05-27 - print number 1812a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback