NY S00905 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an employer's unemployment experience rating account shall not be charged for a claimant whose employment was terminated as the result of the return of an employee after family leave.
Title
Provides that an employer's unemployment experience rating account shall not be charged for a claimant whose employment was terminated as the result of the return of an employee after family leave.
Sponsors
Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1312 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.150 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08012 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to labor