NY S00881 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in addition to any other applicable remedy or penalty, where a building has been altered in violation of any provision of the uniform code or any lawful order obtained thereunder, and such alteration impedes a person's egress from such building during a fire or other emergency evacuation, the owner of such building, and any builder, architect, contractor, subcontractor or construction superintendent, or agent thereof who has knowledge of such alteration, or an owner who reasonably should have had knowledge of such alteration based on either an inspection or repair of a leased premises with consent from the tenant, shall be subject to a civil penalty of up to seven thousand five hundred dollars.
Title
Provides that in addition to any other applicable remedy or penalty, where a building has been altered in violation of any provision of the uniform code or any lawful order obtained thereunder, and such alteration impedes a person's egress from such building during a fire or other emergency evacuation, the owner of such building, and any builder, architect, contractor, subcontractor or construction superintendent, or agent thereof who has knowledge of such alteration, or an owner who reasonably should have had knowledge of such alteration based on either an inspection or repair of a leased premises with consent from the tenant, shall be subject to a civil penalty of up to seven thousand five hundred dollars.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.47 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.66 |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | substituted for a964 |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-01-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.34 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00964 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - substituted by s881