NY S00879 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - PRINT NUMBER 879C
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits the application of the "safe act" to the counties of Kings, Queens, Richmond, New York and Bronx.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits the application of the "safe act" to the counties of Kings, Queens, Richmond, New York and Bronx.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 879C
2017-02-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2017-02-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 879B
2017-02-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2017-01-27SenatePRINT NUMBER 879A
2017-01-27SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2017-01-05SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A06140 (Same As) 2017-02-23 - referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback