NY S00877 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an affirmation of a health care practitioner may be served or filed in an action in lieu of and with same force and effect as an affidavit (changes the current reference in existing provisions from "physician, osteopath or dentist" to "health care practitioner").
Title
Provides that an affirmation of a health care practitioner may be served or filed in an action in lieu of and with same force and effect as an affidavit (changes the current reference in existing provisions from "physician, osteopath or dentist" to "health care practitioner").
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.140 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-03-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.184 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 877A |
2019-02-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00784 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes