NY S00875 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the correctional association's ability to access, visit, inspect, and examine all state correctional facilities.
Title
Relates to the correctional association's ability to access, visit, inspect, and examine all state correctional facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1249 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.28 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01249 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - signed chap.32