NY S00860 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to mandatory training of a forensic evaluator in relation to court ordered forensic evaluations involving child custody and visitation when the child is living out-of-state and is farther than one hundred miles from the New York state border; relates to training in the prevention and intervention of domestic violence required for forensic investigators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to mandatory training of a forensic evaluator in relation to court ordered forensic evaluations involving child custody and visitation when the child is living out-of-state and is farther than one hundred miles from the New York state border; relates to training in the prevention and intervention of domestic violence required for forensic investigators.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A632
2023-01-09SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.69
2023-01-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A00632 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - signed chap.23

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback