NY S00847 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the empire state baseball trails program.
Title
Establishes the empire state baseball trails program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Terry Gipson [D] |
Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.512 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.452 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a8111 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1370 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1525 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A08111 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s847