NY S00842 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding lead testing in water to day care facilities; allows the commissioner to provide financial assistance to those day cares that such testing would pose an unreasonable financial hardship on.
Title
Relates to expanding lead testing in water to day care facilities; allows the commissioner to provide financial assistance to those day cares that such testing would pose an unreasonable financial hardship on.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 842A |
2019-05-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06046 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health