NY S00780 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - VETOED MEMO.218
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - VETOED MEMO.218
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes approval of certain transportation contracts of the Massapequa union free school district which failed to comply with certain filing requirements.
Title
Authorizes approval of certain transportation contracts of the Massapequa union free school district which failed to comply with certain filing requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.218 |
2013-09-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.628 |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a5633a |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-18 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 780A |
2013-06-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-12 | Senate | returned to senate |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.76 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05633 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - substituted by s780a