NY S00768 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 768A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 768A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of aquaculture for the purpose of developing fish-farming businesses as an alternative cash crop for farms across the state and appoints a task force relating thereto.
Title
Provides for the regulation of aquaculture for the purpose of developing fish-farming businesses as an alternative cash crop for farms across the state and appoints a task force relating thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 768A |
2012-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07461 (Same As) 2012-01-26 - print number 7461a