NY S00756 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 756A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 756A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires providers of health care policies to provide coverage for colorectal cancer early detection for persons fifty years of age or older; requires the superintendent of financial services to provide notification to enrollees of such coverage via mail.
Title
Requires providers of health care policies to provide coverage for colorectal cancer early detection for persons fifty years of age or older; requires the superintendent of financial services to provide notification to enrollees of such coverage via mail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 756A |
2016-02-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00102 (Same As) 2016-04-18 - print number 102a