NY S00756 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-22 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-22 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases maximum civil penalties authorized to be imposed for violations of the rules of the New York city transit authority; provides that the notice of violation of any such rule shall be mailed by first class mail, rather than by registered or certified mail.
Title
Increases maximum civil penalties authorized to be imposed for violations of the rules of the New York city transit authority; provides that the notice of violation of any such rule shall be mailed by first class mail, rather than by registered or certified mail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-04-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-04-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.159 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |