NY S00724 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 724A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 724A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the lease of state forests, reforestation areas, wildlife management areas and unique areas for the purpose of gas and oil production.
Title
Prohibits the lease of state forests, reforestation areas, wildlife management areas and unique areas for the purpose of gas and oil production.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 724A |
2024-04-09 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-04-09 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2024-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.336 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.201 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04003 (Same As) 2024-04-02 - amended on third reading (t) 4003a