NY S00692 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of housing and community renewal to calculate the period of rent reduction due to diminution of services from the date of actual diminution of the services.
Title
Requires the division of housing and community renewal to calculate the period of rent reduction due to diminution of services from the date of actual diminution of the services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.994 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-05-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |