NY S00685 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 685B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 685B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to automatic license plate readers (ALPRs) and mandatory postings of policies and annual reporting requirements.
Title
Relates to automatic license plate readers (ALPRs) and mandatory postings of policies and annual reporting requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 685B |
2022-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 685A |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00940 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION