NY S00607 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3656A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3656A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of alternate energy production facilities.
Title
Relates to the definition of alternate energy production facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3656A |
2011-02-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 607B |
2011-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-01-31 | Senate | AMENDED 607A |
2011-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.36 |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |