NY S00585 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-20 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-20 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the removal of an election commissioner by the governor or by affirmative vote of a majority of commissioners of the state board of elections for incompetence, misconduct, or other good cause, provided that prior to removal, such election commissioner shall be given a written copy of the charges against them and have an opportunity to be heard in their defense.
Title
Relates to the removal of an election commissioner by the governor or by affirmative vote of a majority of commissioners of the state board of elections for incompetence, misconduct, or other good cause, provided that prior to removal, such election commissioner shall be given a written copy of the charges against them and have an opportunity to be heard in their defense.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2024-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.621 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 585A |
2024-01-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-01-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-01-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.6 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09162 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - referred to election law