NY S00552 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tuition assistance program awards for dual or concurrent enrollment coursework; awards dual or concurrent enrollment program awards for payment annually to school districts in which dual or concurrent enrollment programs are located.
Title
Relates to tuition assistance program awards for dual or concurrent enrollment coursework; awards dual or concurrent enrollment program awards for payment annually to school districts in which dual or concurrent enrollment programs are located.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-05-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.849 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 552A |
2022-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.895 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |