NY S00530 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health club contracts to allow a buyer to cancel with thirty days' notice; allows a buyer to submit a notice of cancellation by electronic mail in addition to in person, by phone or by mail; requires a health club to accept notice of cancellation via website if such contract was entered into via website; decreases the time necessary for a disability cancellation from six months to three months.
Title
Requires health club contracts to allow a buyer to cancel with thirty days' notice; allows a buyer to submit a notice of cancellation by electronic mail in addition to in person, by phone or by mail; requires a health club to accept notice of cancellation via website if such contract was entered into via website; decreases the time necessary for a disability cancellation from six months to three months.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.996 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |