NY S00528 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.
Title
Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.50 |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | substituted for a1368 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-01-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.13 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-08 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01368 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - substituted by s528