NY S00523 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a methodology for determining major capital improvements (MCI) rent surcharges based on a seven year schedule; provides that such MCIs shall be calculated as a rent surcharge and shall not become part of the base legal regulated rent by which rent increases are calculated, and requires the amount thereof to be separately designated and billed as such; codifies current practices regarding the annual 6% cap on MCI increases and the methodology for determining MCI surcharges based on the number of rooms; requires that rent surcharges authorized for major capital improvements shall cease when the cost of the improvement has been recovered.
Title
Establishes a methodology for determining major capital improvements (MCI) rent surcharges based on a seven year schedule; provides that such MCIs shall be calculated as a rent surcharge and shall not become part of the base legal regulated rent by which rent increases are calculated, and requires the amount thereof to be separately designated and billed as such; codifies current practices regarding the annual 6% cap on MCI increases and the methodology for determining MCI surcharges based on the number of rooms; requires that rent surcharges authorized for major capital improvements shall cease when the cost of the improvement has been recovered.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-12-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 523A |
2011-12-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02459 (Same As) 2012-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES