NY S00518 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a fine of one thousand dollars for a person responsible for a trailer or semitrailer parked or left unattended in a city with a population of one million or more; makes certain exceptions.
Title
Provides a fine of one thousand dollars for a person responsible for a trailer or semitrailer parked or left unattended in a city with a population of one million or more; makes certain exceptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.310 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.264 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02618 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to transportation