NY S00511 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - VETOED MEMO.69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - VETOED MEMO.69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs NYS energy research and development authority to undertake a statewide study of consumer behaviors with respect to energy efficiency and clean energy technology programs.
Title
Directs NYS energy research and development authority to undertake a statewide study of consumer behaviors with respect to energy efficiency and clean energy technology programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.69 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.427 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a42a |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1199 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 511A |
2011-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00042 (Same As) 2011-06-17 - substituted by s511a