NY S00476 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-14 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-14 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires inmates in state and county-owned or operated correctional facilities to make medical co-payments of seven dollars upon receipt of medical treatment; provides that an inmate shall not be refused treatment for lack of ability to pay co-payment charges; directs all moneys collected to be made available for the operation of such correctional facility.
Title
Requires inmates in state and county-owned or operated correctional facilities to make medical co-payments of seven dollars upon receipt of medical treatment; provides that an inmate shall not be refused treatment for lack of ability to pay co-payment charges; directs all moneys collected to be made available for the operation of such correctional facility.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Nozzolio [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2012-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.510 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2011-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 476A |
2011-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.410 |
2011-03-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07870 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to correction