NY S00459 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the provision of financing by the dormitory authority to the Gold Coast public library.
Title
Authorizes the provision of financing by the dormitory authority to the Gold Coast public library.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.10 |
2015-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.467 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.344 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a5251 |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
2015-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-03-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.126 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05251 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - substituted by s459