NY S00410 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a Minority Coordinating Council on Asthmatic Affairs within the department of health to assess the asthma risk factors for the minority citizens of our state, counties and regions; identifies the existing barriers to quality asthma treatment and care among minorities; develops action steps for addressing care issues; launches a state-wide asthma awareness campaign to educate our citizens about the disease; requires report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a Minority Coordinating Council on Asthmatic Affairs within the department of health to assess the asthma risk factors for the minority citizens of our state, counties and regions; identifies the existing barriers to quality asthma treatment and care among minorities; develops action steps for addressing care issues; launches a state-wide asthma awareness campaign to educate our citizens about the disease; requires report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01Assemblyreferred to health
2021-02-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-02-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-01-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-01-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-01-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.105
2021-01-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 410A
2021-01-12SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2021-01-06SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A05828 (Same As) 2021-02-26 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback