NY S00400 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to bonds and notes of the city of Yonkers.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to bonds and notes of the city of Yonkers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Cities 2 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Cities 2 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.168 |
2023-06-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.146 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | substituted for a3598 |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2023-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-04-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-04-17 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.573 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 |
Same As/Similar To
A03598 (Same As) 2023-05-17 - substituted by s400