NY S00385 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - PRINT NUMBER 385A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - PRINT NUMBER 385A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates, as peace officers, public safety officers of the Chautauqua Institution within the grounds of and properties owned by the Chautauqua Institution.
Title
Designates, as peace officers, public safety officers of the Chautauqua Institution within the grounds of and properties owned by the Chautauqua Institution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 385A |
2024-04-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01712 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - print number 1712a