NY S00351 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a 120-day warning period for violations at congressionally chartered veterans' organization facilities.
Title
Requires a 120-day warning period for violations at congressionally chartered veterans' organization facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2022-05-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.966 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |