NY S00321 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacists and certified nurse practitioners to provide hepatitis A and hepatitis B immunizations.
Title
Authorizes pharmacists and certified nurse practitioners to provide hepatitis A and hepatitis B immunizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2025 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 321A |
2018-05-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00455 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education
A09073 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - print number 9073a
A09073 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - print number 9073a