NY S00314 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an extension of time to the purchasing period for tenants to purchase a dwelling unit in a cooperative apartment building.
Title
Provides for an extension of time to the purchasing period for tenants to purchase a dwelling unit in a cooperative apartment building.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2011-03-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO BANKS |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |