NY S00264 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to absentee voting application deadlines; provides all applications requesting an absentee ballot by mail must be received by the board of elections no later than the fifteenth day before the election for a ballot is first requested; provides applications delivered in person shall be received no later than the day before such election.
Title
Relates to absentee voting application deadlines; provides all applications requesting an absentee ballot by mail must be received by the board of elections no later than the fifteenth day before the election for a ballot is first requested; provides applications delivered in person shall be received no later than the day before such election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.273 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.151 |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | substituted for a5783 |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-01-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05783 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - substituted by s264