NY S00240 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 240A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes certain cities to implement a pilot truck weight photo-monitoring system at certain intersections throughout the city; requires owners of trucks to be monetarily liable when an operator of their truck drives the truck on a public highway in violation of a posted "No Truck" zone; establishes certain affirmative defenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes certain cities to implement a pilot truck weight photo-monitoring system at certain intersections throughout the city; requires owners of trucks to be monetarily liable when an operator of their truck drives the truck on a public highway in violation of a posted "No Truck" zone; establishes certain affirmative defenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 240A
2014-03-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2013-01-09SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A03489 (Same As) 2014-03-31 - print number 3489a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback