NY S00179 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 179A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 179A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the state education commissioner to require public school districts to report on compliance with art education instruction requirements.
Title
Directs the state education commissioner to require public school districts to report on compliance with art education instruction requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 179A |
2020-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.991 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |