NY S00150 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the separate utility class (class 3) in New York city.
Title
Eliminates the separate utility class (class 3) in New York city.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-24 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1430 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 150A |
2011-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03184 (Same As) 2011-07-11 - enacting clause stricken
A09203 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - enacting clause stricken
A09979 (Same As) 2012-04-27 - referred to real property taxation
A09203 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - enacting clause stricken
A09979 (Same As) 2012-04-27 - referred to real property taxation