NY S00133 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the legislature to create an office of public advocate with the authority to bring civil action against the state or any of its departments, agencies or bureaus or its public authorities to protect the public's interest in the state's natural and cultural resources.
Title
Directs the legislature to create an office of public advocate with the authority to bring civil action against the state or any of its departments, agencies or bureaus or its public authorities to protect the public's interest in the state's natural and cultural resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-10 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00014 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary