NY S00090 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-06 - PRINT NUMBER 90B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-06 - PRINT NUMBER 90B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons from holding civil office when convicted of certain felonies.
Title
Prohibits persons from holding civil office when convicted of certain felonies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 90B |
2020-07-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-01-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 90A |
2019-01-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08605 (Same As) 2020-02-09 - print number 8605a