NY S00033 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts hiring of child care providers with criminal convictions.
Title
Restricts hiring of child care providers with criminal convictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2018-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.336 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.543 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00402 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to children and families