NY A11593 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - substituted by s8412
Status: Introduced on June 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - substituted by s8412
Summary
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms of employment of certain state officers and employees who are members of the security supervisors unit; authorizes funding of joint labor-management committees; implements an agreement between the state and the employee organization representing the security supervisors unit; and makes an app therefor.
Title
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms of employment of certain state officers and employees who are members of the security supervisors unit; authorizes funding of joint labor-management committees; implements an agreement between the state and the employee organization representing the security supervisors unit; and makes an app therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | substituted by s8412 | |
2010-06-30 | ordered to third reading rules cal.504 | |
2010-06-30 | rules report cal.504 | |
2010-06-30 | reported | |
2010-06-30 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-29 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08412 (Same As) 2010-07-02 - SIGNED CHAP.152
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11593&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |