NY A11506 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies when the family court may order an ACOD either before entry of a fact-finding order or entry of a final disposition; clarifies the procedures applicable when a parent has successfully complied with the conditions of an order suspending judgment.
Title
Clarifies when the family court may order an ACOD either before entry of a fact-finding order or entry of a final disposition; clarifies the procedures applicable when a parent has successfully complied with the conditions of an order suspending judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-07-01 | delivered to senate | |
2010-07-01 | passed assembly | |
2010-07-01 | ordered to third reading rules cal.557 | |
2010-07-01 | rules report cal.557 | |
2010-07-01 | reported | |
2010-06-30 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-28 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-06-18 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08235 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 8235A