NY A11301 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - signed chap.274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - signed chap.274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this legislation is to reduce the amount of products such as fertilizer that contain pesticides that may become waste by allowing retailers and distributors to make minor repairs in accordance with US EPA policy.
Title
Relates to repair of damaged pesticide containers; expands exceptions from transportation ban.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-30 | signed chap.274 | |
2010-07-19 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-22 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-22 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-22 | 3RD READING CAL.1119 | |
2010-06-22 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8128 | |
2010-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-15 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-15 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-14 | ordered to third reading rules cal.116 | |
2010-06-14 | rules report cal.116 | |
2010-06-14 | reported | |
2010-06-03 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-25 | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08128 (Same As) 2010-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11301